CA SB421 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9002 and 13125 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 290, 290.006, 290.008, 290.45, 290.46, 290.5, and 4852.03 of, the Penal Code, relating to sex offenders.
Title
Sex offenders: registration: criminal offender record information systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB421 Wiener et al (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB421 Wiener et al (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 11). |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1325.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1184.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 855.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25 in PUB. S. pending receipt. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1127 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 290 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 290.006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 290.008 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 290.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 290.46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 290.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 4852.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4852.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 9002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 11160 | New Code | See Bill Text |