CA SB420 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 333, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 333, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11105 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal history information.
Title
State summary criminal history information: sentencing information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB420 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 420 Monning Senate Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB420 Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 420 Monning Senate Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB420 Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 333, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2352.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2759.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 643.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 430.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |