CA SB405 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-11 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-11 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 3 (commencing with Section 42710) of Chapter 14 of Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: reclaimed asphalt pavement: pilot project: the County of Los Angeles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Date (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB405 Archuleta et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Result (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Date (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB405 Archuleta et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Result (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1327.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1098.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 843.) (April 24). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 441.) (March 26). |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and EQ. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42710 | New Code | See Bill Text |