CA SB400 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 759, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 230 and 230.1 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment protections: victims of domestic violence, sexual assault, or stalking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB400 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 400 Jackson Senate Third Reading By GOMEZ (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB400 Jackson (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 759, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2013-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 2364.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2013-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 13. Page 3006.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 30).
2013-08-14AssemblySet, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-27AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 25).
2013-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-05-24AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
2013-05-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-13SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 905.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 816.) (May 6).
2013-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2013-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 663.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2013-04-16SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-04-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 486.) (April 10).
2013-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2013-02-28SenateReferred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
2013-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2013-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code230Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code230.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_400&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_bill_20130220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_bill_20130416_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_bill_20130627_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_bill_20130220_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_bill_20130416_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_bill_20130627_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_bill_20130806_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_bill_20130917_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_bill_20131011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_vote_20130410_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_vote_20130423_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_vote_20130506_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_vote_20130513_0120PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_vote_20130612_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_vote_20130625_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_vote_20130830_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_vote_20130909_0134PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_400_vote_20130911_0614PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback