CA SB40 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 467, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 467, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5451, 5452, 5453, 5456, 5462, 5463, and 5555 of, and to add Section 5465.5 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Conservatorship: serious mental illness and substance use disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB40 Wiener et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 40 Wiener Third Reading Urgency By Chiu (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB40 Wiener et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 40 Wiener Third Reading Urgency By Chiu (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB40 Wiener et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 467, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2603.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3043.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | June 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1168.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1088.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 802.) (April 23). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 652.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5451 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5452 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5453 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5456 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5462 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5463 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5465.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5555 | Amended Code | Citation Text |