CA SB398 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 402, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 402, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4353, 4354.5, and 4355 of, to repeal Section 14132.992 of, and to repeal and add Section 4359 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to acquired brain trauma.
Title
Acquired brain trauma.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB398 Monning Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 398 Monning Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB398 Monning (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 398 Monning Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB398 Monning (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 402, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5687.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6483.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | July 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUM. S. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1270.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 625.) (April 4). |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.992 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4353 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4354.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4357 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4357.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4359 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |