CA SB398 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 402, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 4353, 4354.5, and 4355 of, to repeal Section 14132.992 of, and to repeal and add Section 4359 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to acquired brain trauma.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Acquired brain trauma.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB398 Monning Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 398 Monning Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB398 Monning (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 402, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-14 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-24SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5687.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-23SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6483.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-06-27AssemblyJune 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-07-11AssemblyJuly 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUM. S.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1270.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-01SenateMay 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2017-04-17SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-17SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-04-06SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 625.) (April 4).
2017-03-01SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH.
2017-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback