CA SB388 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-12 - In Senate. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-12 - In Senate. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 40440.15 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 21080.06 to the Public Resources Code, relating to the South Coast Air Quality Management District.
Title
South Coast Air Quality Management District: emission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-12 - Assembly - SB 388 Calderon Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-04 - Assembly - SB 388 Calderon Senate Third Reading Amend By FURUTANI Set #1 (Y: 43 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB388 Calderon (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-04 - Assembly - SB 388 Calderon Senate Third Reading Amend By FURUTANI Set #1 (Y: 43 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB388 Calderon (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-12 | In Senate. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-09-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on September 11.) Read second time. Amended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 16. Page 3409.) To Senate. | |
2009-09-11 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3381.) | |
2009-09-04 | Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 3042.) Re-referred to Com. On U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2009-09-03 | From inactive file to third reading file. | |
2009-09-02 | Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico. | |
2009-07-24 | Read second time. To third reading. Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico. | |
2009-07-16 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |
2009-07-14 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-13 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on July 7.) | |
2009-06-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Corrected July 6.) | |
2009-05-28 | To Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2009-05-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 895.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-07 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |
2009-05-06 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 807.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-04-27 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-24 | Set for hearing May 6. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-16 | Set for hearing April 22. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-13 | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-12 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-02-27 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |