CA SB386 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 399.30 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program: irrigation districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - Senate - That the measure be held in committee pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | In committee: That the measure be held in committee pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Set for hearing January 15. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3049.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 842.) (April 24). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | March 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 399.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |