CA SB383 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6700, 19853, and 19853.1 of the Government Code, relating to state holidays.
Title
State holidays: Yom Kippur.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - [Second] hearing set for [04-25-2017]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | April 25 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 5. Page 827.) Reconsideration granted. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | March 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19853 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19853.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |