CA SB380 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 542, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 542, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 443.1, 443.3, 443.4, 443.5, 443.11, 443.14, 443.15, and 443.17 of, and to repeal and add Section 443.215 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to end of life.
Title
End of life.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Assembly - SB 380 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB380 Eggman et al. By Leyva Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB380 Eggman et al (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB380 Eggman et al. By Leyva Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB380 Eggman et al (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 542, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 2633.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 16. Page 3132.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | (Corrected August 31). |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 1282.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1189.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | May 10 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 859.) (April 20). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 605.) (March 24). |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 443.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 443.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 443.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 443.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 443.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 443.215 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 443.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 443.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 443.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |