CA SB380 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 3217 of the Public Resources Code, and to add and repeal Sections 714 and 715 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to natural gas, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural gas storage: moratorium.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB380 Pavley Urgency Clause Concurr (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - SB 380 Pavley Third Reading Urgency By WILK (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB380 Pavley Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2016.
2016-05-10 Approved by the Governor.
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2016-05-02SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3734.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2016-04-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2016-04-28AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 4591.) Ordered to the Senate.
2016-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-04-19AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2016-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13).
2016-03-30AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-03-07AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-03-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (February 22).
2016-02-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
2016-02-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & C.
2016-01-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2016-01-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2981.) (January 28). Ordered to third reading. Unanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2975.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2016-01-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2981.) (January 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-01-28SenateRe-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2016-01-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2015-03-05SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2015-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2015-02-24SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code70050New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code3217New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code713New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code714Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code715Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_380&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_380_bill_20150224_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_380_bill_20160127_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_380_bill_20160216_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_380_bill_20160307_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_380_bill_20160330_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_380_bill_20160419_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_380_bill_20160503_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_380_bill_20160510_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_380_vote_20160128_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_380_vote_20160128_0225PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_380_vote_20160222_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_380_vote_20160413_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_380_vote_20160428_1037AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_380_vote_20160502_0301PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback