CA SB378 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11370 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 29820 of, to repeal Section 1203.073 of, and to repeal and add Section 1203.07 of, the Penal Code, relating to probation.
Title
Probation: eligibility: crimes relating to controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB378 Wiener et al (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 2. Page 3153.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3141.) (January 23). |
2020-01-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | January 21 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 3099.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Set for hearing January 15. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11370 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1203.073 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29820 | Amended Code | Citation Text |