CA SB370 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2031.280 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to discovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discovery: response to inspection demands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB370 Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 9).
2019-06-11AssemblyJune 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-09SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1002.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 906.) (April 30).
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-02SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure2031.280Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback