CA SB365 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14132.72 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

E-consult service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 365 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Robert Rivas (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB365 Caballero et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-06SenateIn Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2021-10-06SenateVetoed by the Governor.
2021-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2021-09-01SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2603.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1189.) (May 20).
2021-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-17SenateMay 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 17.
2021-05-06SenateMay 10 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-05-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-27SenateMay 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-03-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 605.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-16SenateSet for hearing March 24.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14132.72Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback