CA SB363 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1717.5 of the Civil Code, relating to attorney's fees.
Title
Attorney's fees: book accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Assembly - SB 363 Morrell Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB363 Morrell (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB363 Morrell (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2178.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1071.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 982.) (May 12). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1717.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |