CA SB363 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 384, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 384, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4980.01, 4980.03, 4980.36, 4980.42, and 4980.43 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to marriage and family therapists.
Title
Marriage and family therapists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB363 Emmerson Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - SB 363 Emmerson Senate Third Reading By HAYASHI (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB363 Emmerson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - SB 363 Emmerson Senate Third Reading By HAYASHI (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB363 Emmerson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 384, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-08 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2402.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-07 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-06 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2939.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-09-01 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2770.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-15 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-14 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-07-13 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13). | |
2011-07-06 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-05-09 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-09 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 901.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-04-25 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 616.) (April 11). | |
2011-03-25 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2011-03-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4980.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4980.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4980.36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4980.42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4980.43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |