CA SB354 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 687, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1522, 1568.09, 1569.17, and 1596.871, and to add and repeal Section 1521.7 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 309, 319, 361.2, 361.4, 727.05, 11461.3, 11461.36, and 16519.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public social services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-10 - Assembly - SB 354 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Blanca Rubio (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB354 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB354 Skinner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 687, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2021-09-10SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-01AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-01AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2021-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-26AssemblyAugust 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2021-07-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-07-01AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-06-23AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2021-06-08AssemblyJune 16 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-03AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
2021-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1281.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1188.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-10SenateMay 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 935.) (April 27).
2021-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 27.
2021-04-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 685.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-26SenateSet for hearing April 6.
2021-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2021-03-23SenateMarch 23 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-03-09SenateSet for hearing March 23.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
2021-02-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback