CA SB354 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 526, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 70032, 70033, and 70034 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California DREAM Loan Program: graduate degree programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 354 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Medina (Y: 64 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB354 Durazo (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Bill Votes (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-04 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 526, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-04 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 10. Page 3265.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 30).
2019-08-30AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-06-26AssemblyJune 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1184.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1097.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-10SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 547.) (April 3).
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-07SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code70032Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code70033Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code70034Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback