CA SB339 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-18 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-18 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17144.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Taxation: cancellation of indebtedness: mortgage debt forgiveness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - Senate - Special Consent #5 SB339 Cannella (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 972.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 881.) (May 8). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 25536.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 25536.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 67870 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17144.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |