CA SB335 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 234, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 234, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 6990) to Part 3 of Division 4 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to nurseries.
Title
Nursery Advisory Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 335 Cannella Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB335 Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB335 Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 234, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2768.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 960.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 726.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | April 4 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 53333 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 6990 | New Code | See Bill Text |