CA SB330 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 572, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 572, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 17 (commencing with Section 81560) of Chapter 2 of Part 49 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Los Angeles Community College District Affordable Housing Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB330 Durazo Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 330 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Santiago (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB330 Durazo (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 330 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Santiago (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB330 Durazo (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 572, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2521.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2472.) |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Set for hearing September 7. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2315.) Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2021-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 11. Page 2602.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2021-08-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-08-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 16. Page 2468.) |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1414.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1187.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 668.) (March 10). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 10. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 81560 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |