CA SB330 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 654, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 654, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65589.5 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 65940, 65943, and 65950 of, to add and repeal Sections 65905.5, 65913.10, and 65941.1 of, and to add and repeal Chapter 12 (commencing with Section 66300) of Division 1 of Title 7 of, the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing Crisis Act of 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB330 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 330 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Daly (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB330 Skinner (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 330 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Daly (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB330 Skinner (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 654, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 2608.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 8. Page 3044.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2019-08-28 | Assembly | August 28 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1353.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1096.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 774.) (April 22). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 713.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65589.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65940 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65943 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65950 | New Code | See Bill Text |