CA SB302 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 484, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 484, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1649.1, 1649.2, 1649.3, and 1649.6 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care facilities.
Title
Compassionate Access to Medical Cannabis Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Assembly - SB 302 Stern Senate Third Reading By Waldron (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB302 Stern et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB302 Stern et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB302 Stern et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB302 Stern et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 484, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2823.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3524.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1252.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1164.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 798.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 575.) (March 29). |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1649.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1649.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1649.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1649.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |