CA SB30 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 297, 297.1, 298, 298.5, 298.6, 298.7, and 299.2 of, and to repeal Section 299.3 of, the Family Code, relating to domestic partnership.
Title
Domestic partnership.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-05 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB30 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - SB 30 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB30 Wiener (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - SB 30 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB30 Wiener (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 1954.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 2489.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 817.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 438.) (March 26). |
2019-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 297 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 297.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 298 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 298.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 298.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 298.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 299.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 299.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |