CA SB297 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 483, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 483, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9604 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: initiatives and referenda: withdrawal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB297 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Assembly - SB 297 Allen Senate Third Reading By Pellerin (Y: 62 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB297 Allen (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Assembly - SB 297 Allen Senate Third Reading By Pellerin (Y: 62 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB297 Allen (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 483, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-18 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2672.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 18. Page 3137.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 28). |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 7). |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1071.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 424.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 9604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |