CA SB297 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to medical marijuana.
Title
Medical marijuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2791.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 726.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | April 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10508 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18901.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18914 | Amended Code | Citation Text |