CA SB288 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 7800 of, to add Section 7217 to, and add and repeal Sections 7231 and 7785 of, the Elections Code, relating to political parties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Democratic Party of California: Peace and Freedom Party of California: county central committees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB288 Wiener et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-04AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-08-19AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on E. & R. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2019-08-19AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-08-19AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-07-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-09AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-07-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2019-06-24AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-06-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2019-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2019-06-18AssemblyJuly 10 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-18AssemblyJune 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1246.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1095.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 650.) (April 10).
2019-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-03-26SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-03-25SenateApril 2 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code7210New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code7217New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code7231New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code7785Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code7800Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code2817New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code2829.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code913.14New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback