CA SB284 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 912 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile justice: county support of wards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB284 Beall et al (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 26).
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-05-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 920.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-04SenateApril 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 8.
2019-03-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 440.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-02-26SenateSet for hearing March 26.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code912Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback