CA SB275 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-21 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-21 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6704, 6706.3, 6730, 6737.3, 6738, 6740, 6741, and 6787 of, to add Sections 6702.3, 6702.4, 6702.5, 6702.6, 6702.7, 6702.8, 6702.9, 6702.10, 6702.11, 6730.6, 6730.7, and 6731.7 to, and to repeal Section 6704.1 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to engineers.
Title
Professional engineers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-21 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2010-01-11 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 0. Page 2648.) | |
2010-01-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2009-12-11 | Set for hearing January 11. | |
2009-04-21 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 580.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2009-03-27 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2009-02-25 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2009-02-24 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |