CA SB274 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 763, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 763, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 54954.1 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government meetings: agenda and documents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-23 - Assembly - SB 274 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Luz Rivas (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB274 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB274 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 763, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2477.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 886.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 633.) (March 25). |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54954.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |