CA SB274 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 4 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-10 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 798.34 and 798.74 of, and to add Section 798.62 to, the Civil Code, relating to mobilehome residency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobilehome parks: tenancies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB274 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 274 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Limón (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB274 Dodd (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-09-04SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-03SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-19AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-08-19AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-07-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-09AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-07-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2019-06-25AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-05-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-13SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1027.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 905.) (April 30).
2019-04-02SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code798.34Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code798.62New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code798.74Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback