CA SB273 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 385, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 385, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1, 2, 4, 5, 7, 12, and 14 of Chapter 489 of the Statutes of 2001, relating to tidelands and submerged lands.
Title
Tidelands and submerged lands: City and County of San Francisco: Piers 30-32: mixed-use development.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Matt Haney [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB273 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Assembly - SB 273 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Haney (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB273 Wiener et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Assembly - SB 273 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Haney (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB273 Wiener et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 385, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2598.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3002.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-13 | Assembly | June 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1078.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 899.) (April 25). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |