CA SB269 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 762, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 762, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14250, 14409, 14410, 14456, 14556, 14807, 14811, 14851, and 15050 of, and to repeal Section 14655 of, the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
Credit unions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB269 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - SB 269 Portantino Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB269 Portantino (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - SB 269 Portantino Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB269 Portantino (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 762, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2439.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 2124.) |
2021-06-25 | Assembly | June 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | June 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 658.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 456.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Set for hearing March 10. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 14250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14409 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14456 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14556 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14655 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14807 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14811 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14851 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 15050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |