CA SB268 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Hearing: Jul 2 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 667.5 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes: serious and violent felonies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB268 Alvarado-Gil et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2024-06-04AssemblyJune 4 hearing postponed by committee.
2023-06-27AssemblyJune 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2023-05-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1297.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-23SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1163.) (May 18).
2023-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-05-08SenateMay 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2023-04-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 802.) (April 18).
2023-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
2023-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2023-02-09SenateReferred to Com. on PUB S.
2023-02-01SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
2023-01-31SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code667.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback