CA SB268 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 761, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 761, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5795.10, 5796, 5796.10, and 5796.20 of the Public Resources Code, relating to parks and recreation.
Title
Parks and recreation: Lower Los Angeles River Recreation and Park District: Lower San Gabriel River Recreation and Park District: establishment: board of directors.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Lisa Calderon [D] | Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] |
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 268 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB268 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB268 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 761, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2688.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and W.,P., & W. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1343.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1185.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 633.) (March 25). |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5795.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5796 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5796.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5796.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |