CA SB260 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11450 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
CalWORKs: aid payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB260 Menjivar et al (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB260 Menjivar et al (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | July 12 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1360.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1162.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 655.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 426.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMANS S. and G.O. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |