CA SB258 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9015 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to aging.
Title
Aging.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] |
Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Chris Ward [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-15 - Assembly - SB 258 Laird Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB258 Laird et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB258 Laird et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-07-15 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2373.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | June 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1035.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 422.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 9. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9015 | Amended Code | Citation Text |