CA SB256 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 802 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 20116, 20657, 20922, and 22033 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: criminal offenses and statute of limitations.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read first time. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20657 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20922 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 22033 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |