CA SB252 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1834.9.3 to the Civil Code, relating to animal testing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Toxicological testing on dogs and cats.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB252 Wiener et al (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-26AssemblyAugust 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 1384.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1185.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-04-20SenateApril 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2021-04-08SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 686.) (April 6).
2021-03-17SenateSet for hearing April 6.
2021-03-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-02-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-26SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25.
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1834.9.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback