CA SB248 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6601 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexually violent predators: open court proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB248 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-04-05SenateApril 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-03-25SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2021-03-23SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 521.) (March 16).
2021-02-24SenateSet for hearing March 16.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-01-25SenateRead first time.
2021-01-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code6601Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback