CA SB242 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-12 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-12 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 27567 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Toll collection: alternative technologies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - Senate - Special Consent #4 SB242 Wyland (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-12 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-07-01 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 907.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 568.) (April 16). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2699 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 27567 | New Code | See Bill Text |