CA SB24 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6323.5 to the Family Code, relating to domestic violence.
Title
Domestic violence: protective orders: information pertaining to a child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB24 Caballero et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Assembly - SB 24 Caballero Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB24 Caballero et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Assembly - SB 24 Caballero Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB24 Caballero et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1902.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2277.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 654.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 422.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 9. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 6323.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |