CA SB24 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 197, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1798.29 and 1798.82 of the Civil Code, relating to personal information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal information: privacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-08-18 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB24 Simitian Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Assembly - SB 24 Simitian Senate Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB24 Simitian (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-08-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 197, Statutes of 2011.
2011-08-31 Approved by the Governor.
2011-08-23 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2011-08-18 Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 1974.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2011-08-15 In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2011-08-15 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 2388.) Ordered to the Senate.
2011-07-07 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-07-06 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (July 6).
2011-06-20 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-06-16 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14).
2011-05-02 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-04-14 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2011-04-14 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 652.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2011-04-12 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-04-11 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2011-04-01 Set for hearing April 11.
2011-03-29 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-03-25 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 415.) (March 22).
2011-03-11 Set for hearing March 22.
2011-01-20 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2010-12-07 From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
2010-12-06 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1798.29Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.82Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_24&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_bill_20101206_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_bill_20110329_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_bill_20110620_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_bill_20110819_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_bill_20110831_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_vote_20110322_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_vote_20110414_1026AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_vote_20110614_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_vote_20110706_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_vote_20110815_1241PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_vote_20110818_1133AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback