CA SB237 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-28 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-28 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 56337.5 of the Education Code, relating to special education.
Title
Special education: dyslexia risk screening.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB237 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1349.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | March 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 667.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 10. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 56337.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |