CA SB236 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66025 of, and to add Sections 66020.9 and 66201.6 to, the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: University of California: California State University: student financial assistance: tuition and mandatory systemwide fees: admission of out-of-state students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2017-04-20 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 782.) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66020.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 66025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66028 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66201.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |