CA SB234 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Set for hearing March 9.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Hearing: Mar 9 @ 1:30 pm in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 50230) to Part 1 of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing, and making and appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transition Aged Youth Housing Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23SenateSet for hearing March 9.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HOUSING.
2021-01-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code50230New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback