CA SB234 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to fishing.
Title
Fishing: local regulation: report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB234 Berryhill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB234 Berryhill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 585.) (April 3). |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 364.) (March 14). |
2017-02-18 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 5504 | New Code | See Bill Text |