CA SB229 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 721, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 721, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 98.74 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Discrimination: complaints: administrative review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB229 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 229 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB229 Hertzberg (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 229 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB229 Hertzberg (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 721, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2500.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 13. Page 2964.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 21). |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 819.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 653.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 466.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 98.74 | Amended Code | Citation Text |