CA SB226 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 855, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 84305.7 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political Reform Act of 1974: slate mailers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB226 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Assembly - SB 226 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By GALLAGHER (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB226 Hertzberg (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 855, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-21 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
2017-09-14 Ordered to enrgrossing and enrolling.
2017-08-31 Held at desk.
2017-08-31 Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate.
2017-08-25SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2017-08-21SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 2170.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-07-18SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-07-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 7. Page 2579.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 28).
2017-06-15AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 14).
2017-05-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-08SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 985.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-01SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 743.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-23SenateRe-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-03-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-16SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-03SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
2017-02-02SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code84305.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback